Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2803363 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2803363



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 258
09.02.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.04.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
09.03.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.02.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.02.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
21.02.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
21.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.10.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.10.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.10.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.10.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
24.10.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 32
24.10.2016 Text intended for grant (sequence listing) Search / examination 2
21.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.03.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
21.03.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 25
21.03.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
21.03.2016 Description Search / examination 25
21.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.03.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
21.03.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.11.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
23.11.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.11.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
20.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
20.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
20.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.11.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
22.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
21.07.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
28.10.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
28.10.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 5
28.10.2013 European search report Search / examination 3
30.09.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
20.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.09.2013 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
02.08.2013 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
25.07.2013 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
25.07.2013 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
19.07.2013 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
10.07.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.07.2013 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 3
10.07.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.07.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.06.2013 The request for correction will be decided by the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.06.2013 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
12.06.2013 Note on telephone consultation Search / examination 1
05.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.06.2013 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 3
05.06.2013 Description Search / examination 1
05.06.2013 Drawings Search / examination 5
05.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.06.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
31.05.2013 Deficiencies in sequence listing Search / examination 2
13.05.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
13.05.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
13.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
13.05.2013 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 2
13.05.2013 Description Search / examination 25
13.05.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2013 Drawings Search / examination 6
13.05.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4