Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2803363


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019 [2019/47]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
23.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.04.2018  [2018/17]
09.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
09.02.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
03.03.2017 (Expected) grant published on  05.04.2017  [2017/14]
25.02.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
24.02.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
24.02.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.10.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.03.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.03.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
02.12.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.11.2015 First examination report
16.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.03.2015 Change - designated states published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
27.03.2015 Change - request for examination published on  29.04.2015  [2015/18]
26.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
18.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
17.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]