Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2803710

EP2803710 - Adhesive film for graphics containing an anti-graffiti coating [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.10.2015
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.11.2015  [2015/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
P.O.Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Audenaert, Frans
3M Belgium NV
Haven 1005
Canadastraat 11
2070 Zwijndrecht / BE
02 / Jost, Michael
3M Deutschland GmbH
Carl-Schurz-Str. 1
41453 Neuss / DE
03 / Buerger, Johannes
3M Deutschland GmbH
Carl-Schurz-Str. 1
41453 Neuss / DE
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Gabriel, Kiroubagaranne , et al
3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L.
Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
[2014/47]
Application number, filing date13167584.514.05.2013
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2803710
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:C09J7/02, C08F290/06, C09D183/10, C09D151/08
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Klebefilm für Grafiken mit Antigraffitibeschichtung[2014/47]
English:Adhesive film for graphics containing an anti-graffiti coating[2014/47]
French:Film adhésif pour graphismes contenant un revêtement anti-graffitis[2014/47]
Examination procedure14.05.2013Examination requested  [2014/47]
20.05.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/48]
26.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/48]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP1076081  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0095]; example 1 * * claims 1, 4, 6 * [Y] 6-8 [I] 2,3,5,9-15;
 [XYI]EP1002846  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0110]; examples 1-6 * * claims 1-4, 20, 21 * [Y] 6-8 [I] 9-15;
 [IY]EP0006705  (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [I] 1-5,9-15 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 29 * * page 5, line 19 - page 7, line 4 * * page 7, line 22 - page 8, line 32 * * page 11, line 1 - line 6 * * page 17, line 22 - line 30 * * page 18, line 6 - line 17 * * claims 1, 18 * [Y] 6-8;
 [XYI]EP2192166  (PULSE ROLL LABEL PRODUCTS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0035] * * claims 1, 3, 4, 11 * [Y] 6-8 [I] 9-15;
 [XYI]WO9216590  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 6, line 21 - page 7, line 3 * * page 20, line 1 - line 15 * * page 21, line 19 - line 31 * * page 25, line 26 - line 35 * * page 30, line 20 - line 35; example 1 * * claims 1, 9 * [Y] 8 [I] 9-15;
 [A]WO9735930  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 6, line 23 - line 26 * * page 22, line 28 - page 23, line 3 * * page 24, line 26 - page 25, line 2 * * page 25, line 29 - page 26, line 5 * * page 32, line 11 - line 15; example 1 * * page 34, line 22 - line 26; example 7 * * claims 16, 17, 19 *;
 [Y]US4725630  (MAGEE WALTER L [US] ET AL) [Y] 6 * column 1, line 46 - line 51 * * claim 1 *;
 [Y]WO0181466  (DSM NV [NL]; JSR CORP [JP]; JAPAN FINE COATINGS CO LTD [JP]; YAMAGUCHI) [Y] 6-8 * page 15, line 17 - page 16, line 34 * * page 17, line 1 - page 24, line 20 * * claims 1, 19 *
by applicantEP2463325
 US4994322
 US4968562
 EP0570515
 EP0617708
 US5296277
 US5362516
 US5141790
 WO9601687
 USRE24906E
 US4833179
 US5209971
 US2736721
 US5461134
 US4181752
 US4418120
 WO9513331
 EP0951518
 US2008299346
    - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, WILEY-INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1988), vol. 13
    - Encyclopedia of Polymer Scieinced and Engineering, WILEY-INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1964), vol. 13