Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2750093

EP2750093 - Verifying system and method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 06.12.2017  [2017/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Priceplay Taiwan Inc.
4F., No.118, Sec. 1
Neihu Road
Neihu District
Taipei City 114 / TW
[2015/22]
Former [2014/27]For all designated states
Dadny Inc.
4F., No.118, Sec. 1
Neihu Rd.
Neihu Dist.
114 Taipei City / TW
Inventor(s)01 / Shih, Daniel
2F., No.173, Sec. 6, Minquan E. Rd., Neihu Dist.
114 Taipei City / TW
02 / Wu, Ching-Yi
4F., No.15-1, Ln. 485, Sec. 1, Guangfu Rd., East
Dist.
300 Hsinchu City / TW
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
[2014/40]
Former [2014/27]von Hirschhausen, Helge
Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Straße 14
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date13167783.315.05.2013
[2014/27]
Priority number, dateTW2012015028326.12.2012         Original published format: TW 101150283
[2014/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2750093
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/02
[2014/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Überprüfungssystem und Verfahren dafür[2014/27]
English:Verifying system and method thereof[2014/27]
French:Système de vérification et procédé associé[2014/27]
Examination procedure06.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/27]
07.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.05.2017
15.05.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
27.06.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/49]
07.07.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/49]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.10.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010102117  (REGENSBURGER MARCUS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * the whole document * [I] 4,9
by applicantTWM423879U