Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2803532

EP2803532 - MIRROR DEVICE FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/47]Mirror device for motor vehicles
[2017/24]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fico Mirrors S.A.
Ed. Trade
Gran Via Carles III 98 5
08028 Barcelona / ES
[2014/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Hellin Navarro, Sergio
C/ Alguersuari i Pascual, 29, 1º 4ª
08203 SABADELL / ES
02 / Ruiz Ortega, Nestor
C/Escultor Armengol, 31, 3º 2ª
08222 TERRASSA / ES
03 / Novella, Maria Luisa
Passeig Camp del Roure, 54, 4º 2ª
08227 TERRASSA / ES
04 / Montero Foix, Carles
C/ Hospitalet, 4, 1º 1ª
08980 SANT FELIU DE LLOBREGAT / ES
05 / Pujadas Beltran, Josep
C/ Jacint Verdaguer, 104, B2
08330 PREMIA DE MAR / ES
06 / Lopez Galera, Robert
Fico Mirrors, S. A.
Edifici Trade. Gran Via Carles III, 98, 5º
08028 BARCELONA / ES
07 / Espinosa, Jose Manuel
Fico Mirrors, S. A.
Edifici Trade. Gran Via Carles III, 98, 5º
08028 BARCELONA / ES
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1
08002 Barcelona / ES
[2014/47]
Application number, filing date13168243.717.05.2013
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2803532
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2803532
Date:01.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:B60R1/12, B60Q1/26
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
Former [2014/47]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SPIEGELVORRICHTUNG FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE[2017/24]
English:MIRROR DEVICE FOR MOTOR VEHICLES[2017/24]
French:DISPOSITIF DE MIROIR POUR VÉHICULES À MOTEUR[2017/24]
Former [2014/47]Spiegelvorrichtung für Kraftfahrzeuge
Former [2014/47]Mirror device for motor vehicles
Former [2014/47]Dispositif de miroir pour véhicules à moteur
Examination procedure15.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/27]
04.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.09.2017Fee for grant paid
22.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.01.2016
Opposition(s)02.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
IE17.05.2018
LU17.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/19]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
IE17.05.2018
LU17.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/17]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
LU17.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/40]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/39]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/37]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/35]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/24]AT01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
NO01.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]GB2338693  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,9,10,12-15 * page 1 - page 4; figure - * [I] 7;
 [AD]US7195385  (ZIMMERMANN WERNER [DE] ET AL) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US2001055214  (CHANG CHIA-JUNG [TW]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1391755  (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE] HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020]; figure - *;
 [A]US2008089080  (KAWAJI YASUSHI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0053]; figure - *;
 [A]US2006146555  (INABA TETSUAKI [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0080]; figure - *
ExaminationUS2011001428
 US7396147
by applicantUS7195385
 US2001055214