Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2806280 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2806280



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 109
14.10.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
06.10.2015 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
01.10.2015 Closing of application Search / examination 1
30.09.2015 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
10.06.2015 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
26.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.05.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
26.05.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
26.05.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
26.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
01.12.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
29.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
21.07.2014 Annex Search / examination 3
01.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
01.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
06.12.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.12.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 2
06.12.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
12.11.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
21.05.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.05.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
21.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 5
21.05.2013 Description Search / examination 16
21.05.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.05.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.05.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.05.2013 Drawings Search / examination 10
21.05.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
21.05.2013 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 25
21.05.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5