Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806280

EP2806280 - Detecting electrical islands using wide-area measurements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  02.10.2015
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 04.11.2015  [2015/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Research Ltd.
Affolternstrasse 44
8050 Zürich / CH
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Krata, Jaroslaw
14/20 Smugowa St
97-200 Tomaszów Mazowiecki Lódzkie / PL
02 / Balcerek, Przemyslaw
8 Galaktyczna St
30-389 Kraków Malopolskie / PL
03 / Nuqui, Reynaldo
245 Churchview Street
Cary, NC 27513 / US
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Postiglione, Ferruccio , et al
Gregorj S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via L. Muratori, 13 b
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Postiglione, Ferruccio , et al
Gregorj S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via Muratori, 13 b
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date13168510.921.05.2013
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806280
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01R31/08, H02J3/38
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
Former [2014/48]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Erkennung elektrischer Inseln unter Verwendung grossflächiger Messungen[2014/48]
English:Detecting electrical islands using wide-area measurements[2014/48]
French:Détection des îlots électriques utilisant des mesures de longue portée[2014/48]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
26.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/27]
30.09.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[Y]US7225087  (SICILIANO ROBERT [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-21 * paragraph [0044]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0051] *;
 [Y]  - A. ETXEGARAI, P. EGUIA, I. ZAMORA, "Analysis of Remote Islanding Detection Methods for Distributed Resources", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON RENEWABLE ENERGIES AND POWER QUALITY (ICREPQ'11), (20110413), XP002716559 [Y] 1-21 * page 4, paragraph A.1 *
 [Y]  - SCHWEITZER, WHITEHEAD, ZWEIGLE, RAVIKUMAR, "Synchrophasor based power system protection and control application", 2010 TEXAS A&M CONFERENCE FOR PROTECTIVE RELAY ENGINEERS, (20100329), XP002716560 [Y] 1-21 * page 4 - page 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CPRE.2010.5469481