Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806549

EP2806549 - Control methods for power converters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.10.2015
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.11.2015  [2015/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GE Energy Power Conversion Technology Ltd
Boughton Road
Rugby
Warwickshire CV21 1BU / GB
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Banham-Hall, Dominic David
6 Robins Close
Hartwell
Northampton NN7 2HZ / GB
02 / Butcher, Martin Samuel
17 Hillfield Road
Rugby, Warwickshire CV22 7EW / GB
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Serjeants LLP
Dock
75 Exploration Drive
Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Serjeants LLP
25 The Crescent
King Street
Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB
Application number, filing date13168560.421.05.2013
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806549
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:H02M3/158
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
Former [2014/48]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Steuerverfahren für Stromwandler[2014/48]
English:Control methods for power converters[2014/48]
French:Procédés de commande de convertisseurs de puissance[2014/48]
Examination procedure13.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
27.05.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/48]
03.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2015/48]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1536549  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,4 * paragraphs [0004] , [0012] - [0024]; figures 1-4 * [I] 2,3,5,6;
 [I]US2004070283  (MAPLE ROBERT [US]) [I] 1-6 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0013] , [0018] , [0019]; figure 3 *;
 [I]FR2790616  (SAGEM [FR]) [I] 1,4 * page 9, line 21 - page 10, line 5; figures 2,3 *