blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2806549 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2806549



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 48
28.10.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
16.10.2015 Closing of application Search / examination 1
03.07.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
03.07.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
13.05.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
27.04.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
01.12.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
29.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
29.04.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.09.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.09.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 3
25.09.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
23.08.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
27.05.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
27.05.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
21.05.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
21.05.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
21.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
21.05.2013 Description Search / examination 11
21.05.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.05.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.05.2013 Drawings Search / examination 3
21.05.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4