blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2806549 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410216365 EP13168560



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2014347899Global Dossier 27.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13168560 21.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104184330Global Dossier 03.12.2014A
Priority number Date
EP13168560 21.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2806549Global Dossier 26.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13168560 21.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR102014012240 26.05.2015A2
Priority number Date
EP13168560 21.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2851931 21.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13168560 21.05.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IN2465CHE2014 03.07.2015A
Priority number Date
EP13168560 21.05.2013