Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805825

EP2805825 - Liquid transfer apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  03.06.2016
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2016Refusal of applicationpublished on 06.07.2016  [2016/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CRABTREE OF GATESHEAD LIMITED
Kingsway
Team Valley Trading Estate
Gateshead
Tyne & Wear NE11 0SU / GB
[2014/48]
Representative(s)Vinsome, Rex Martin
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
12th Floor
Cale Cross House
156 Pilgrim Street
Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB
[2014/48]
Application number, filing date13168748.522.05.2013
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805825
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:B41F31/00, B41F31/15, B41F33/00, B41F23/08
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Flüssigkeitsübertragungsvorrichtung[2014/48]
English:Liquid transfer apparatus[2014/48]
French:Appareil de transfert de liquides[2014/48]
Examination procedure22.05.2013Examination requested  [2014/48]
03.12.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2016/27]
13.12.2014Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/27]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1820648  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE] MANROLAND AG [DE] MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH [) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * claim 9 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0007] , [0010] - [0014] - [0022] , [0025] - [0031] - [0042] , [0048] * * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]DE102004048149  (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0018] - [0020] * * figures 1-2 *;
 [A]DE102007041680  (MANROLAND AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *