Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.06.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
04.07.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.12.2014 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | |
25.11.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
24.10.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |