Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805985

EP2805985 - Polymer containing hydroxysilane and silane groups [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.10.2015
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.11.2015  [2015/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sika Technology AG
Zugerstrasse 50
6340 Baar / CH
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Kramer, Andreas
Möhrlistrasse 90
8006 Zürich / CH
02 / Burckhardt, Urs
Ackersteinstrasse 207
8049 Zürich / CH
03 / Stadelmann, Ursula
In Böden 49
8046 Zürich / CH
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Sika Patent Attorneys
c/o Sika Technology AG
Corp. IP Dept.
Tüffenwies 16
Postfach
8048 Zürich / CH
[2014/48]
Application number, filing date13168803.822.05.2013
[2014/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805985
Date:26.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:C08G77/26
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Hydroxysilan und Silangruppen-haltiges Polymer[2014/48]
English:Polymer containing hydroxysilane and silane groups[2014/48]
French:Hydroxysilane et polymère contenant des groupes silanes[2014/48]
Examination procedure22.05.2013Examination requested  [2014/48]
27.05.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/47]
02.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/47]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2004161846  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP2180001  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claim 4 *;
 [A]US2946701  (PLUEDDEMANN EDWIN P) [A] 1-15 * column 1, lines 40-45 *;
 [A]WO9638453  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP2468759  (SIKA TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-15 *
by applicantUS5587502
 US8049027