Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806149

EP2806149 - Fuel injector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.10.2015
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.11.2015  [2015/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi International Operations Luxembourg S.à r.l.
Avenue de Luxembourg
4940 Bascharage / LU
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Winandy, Jean-Pierre
75 Rue de Bastogne
6700 Arlon / BE
02 / Genco, Callisto
9 Rue Guido Oppenheim
L2263 Luxembourg / LU
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Neill, Andrew Peter
Delphi Diesel Systems
Patent Department
Courteney Road
Gillingham, Kent ME8 0RU / GB
[2014/48]
Application number, filing date13168843.423.05.2013
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806149
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:F02M51/06, F02M63/02
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Kraftstoffeinspritzdüse[2014/48]
English:Fuel injector[2014/48]
French:Injecteur de carburant[2014/48]
Examination procedure23.05.2013Examination requested  [2014/48]
27.05.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/48]
09.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/48]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2010006676  (SUZUKI TAKASHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-9,11,12,14 * paragraphs [0027] - [0030]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 13;
 [XY]DE10326046  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-9,11,12,14 * figure 2 * [Y] 13;
 [XAY]US2005077394  (IGASHIRA TOSHIHIKO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-3,8,9 * paragraphs [0185] - [0190]; figure 10 * [A] 4-7,11 [Y] 13;
 [XAY]DE102010040938  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,8-12,14 * figure 2 * [A] 4-7 [Y] 13;
 [XY]US2009277978  (MATSUMOTO TEPPEI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-9,11,12,14 * paragraph [0028]; figure 1 * [Y] 13;
 [XY]DE10333427  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-5,14 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015]; figure . * [Y] 13;
 [Y]US2008041344  (WING RICHARD [CA] ET AL) [Y] 13 * paragraph [0056]; figure 1 *