Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2805924 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2805924



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 563
04.01.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.03.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.01.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
09.01.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
09.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.09.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.09.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.09.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.09.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 84
20.09.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 84
11.08.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.08.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
11.08.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 79
11.08.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
11.08.2017 Description Search / examination 78
11.08.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.08.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.05.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
31.05.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.02.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
23.02.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
23.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.02.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
17.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
17.11.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.08.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.08.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
26.08.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
26.08.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.08.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
03.05.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
03.05.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.03.2016 Brief communication to applicant/representative (Legal Division) Search / examination 1
15.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.03.2016 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
15.01.2016 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 3
13.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.01.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
15.09.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
15.09.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.08.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
20.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.05.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.05.2015 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 7
01.12.2014 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
29.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
26.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.12.2013 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
30.10.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
22.10.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.10.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.10.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.10.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 3
09.10.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
01.10.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
28.08.2013 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 4
05.08.2013 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
06.06.2013 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.06.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
24.05.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.05.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
24.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
24.05.2013 Description Search / examination 77
24.05.2013 Drawings Search / examination 3
24.05.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5