Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2805924


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
05.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
22.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
04.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.02.2019  [2019/06]
30.12.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  30.01.2019  [2019/05]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
03.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.09.2018  [2018/36]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
19.01.2018 (Expected) grant published on  21.02.2018  [2018/08]
16.01.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
16.01.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
12.01.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
19.09.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
15.08.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.06.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.05.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.02.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.09.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.05.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.04.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.03.2016 Change - inventor
05.02.2016 Change - inventor published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
19.01.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.09.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.09.2015 First examination report
27.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.05.2015 Amendment by applicant
25.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
24.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
25.10.2013 New entry: Fee payment for extension state