Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805924

EP2805924 - Multiple batch system for the preparation of a solution of calcium hydrogen carbonate suitable for the remineralization of desalinated water and of naturally soft water [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.12.2018
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.09.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Omya International AG
Baslerstrasse 42
4665 Oftringen / CH
[2014/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Poffet, Martine
Langhagstrasse 28
4600 Olten / CH
02 / Skovby, Michael
Wampflenstraße 52
8706 Meilen / CH
 [2018/08]
Former [2016/10]01 / Poffet, Martine
Langhagstrasse 28
4600 Otten / CH
02 / Skovby, Michael
Wampflenstraße 52
8706 Meilen / CH
Former [2014/48]01 / Poffet, Martine
Belpstraße 30
3007 Berne / CH
02 / Skovby, Michael
Wampflenstraße 52
8706 Meilen / CH
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/48]Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date13169161.024.05.2013
[2014/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805924
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2805924
Date:21.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/68, A23L2/52, A23L2/54
[2014/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBA22.10.2013
ME22.10.2013
TitleGerman:Mehrchargensystem zur Herstellung einer Lösung aus Calciumhydrogencarbonat, das zur Remineralisierung von salzbefreitem Wasser und von natürlich weichem Wasser geeignet ist[2014/48]
English:Multiple batch system for the preparation of a solution of calcium hydrogen carbonate suitable for the remineralization of desalinated water and of naturally soft water[2014/48]
French:Système de lots multiples pour la préparation d'une solution de carbonate d'hydrogène de calcium convenant pour la reminéralisation de l'eau dessalée et de l'eau naturellement douce[2014/48]
Examination procedure24.05.2013Examination requested  [2014/48]
20.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
11.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2018Fee for grant paid
09.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.09.2015
Opposition(s)22.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
IE24.05.2018
LU24.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/19]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
IE24.05.2018
LU24.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/17]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
LU24.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SI21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
MC21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
SM21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
DK21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
CZ21.02.2018
EE21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
PL21.02.2018
RO21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
SK21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL21.02.2018
AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
BG21.05.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT21.02.2018
CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
LV21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
RS21.02.2018
SE21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
GR22.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY21.02.2018
ES21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY21.02.2018
FI21.02.2018
HR21.02.2018
LT21.02.2018
NL21.02.2018
NO21.05.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2009047764  (IDE TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL]; LIBERMAN BORIS [IL]; ILEVICKY-OZEL MAYA [IL) [X] 1-10,12-17 * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 12; figures 1-5; claims 1-4,33 * * page 14, line 3 - page 15, line 17 * [I] 11;
 [ID]WO2012020056  (OMYA DEVELOPMENT AG [CH]; SKOVBY MICHAEL [CH]; POFFET MARTINE [CH]; BU) [ID] 1-17 * examples 1-4; claims 1,16 *;
 [I]WO2013014026  (OMYA DEVELOPMENT AG [CH]; SKOVBY MICHAEL [CH]; POFFET MARTINE [CH]) [I] 1-17 * example 1; claims 1,16,17 *;
 [I]US3833463  (CROOM H) [I] 1-17 * column 2, line 51 - column 7, line 50; claims 1,11-13 *;
 [I]SU1412232  (BARANOV YU S [SU], et al) [I] 1-17 * abstract *;
 [AD]US7771599  (CHOI YOUNG CHUL [US] ET AL) [AD] 1-17 * claims 1-4 *;
 [A]US2011217227  (ENGSL FZE [AE] ET AL) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0007] , [0018] - [0024]; claims 6,7,13-15,20 *
ExaminationUS2012128572
by applicantUS7374694
 EP0520826
 US5914046
 US7771599
 WO2012020056
 WO2010023742
 WO2012113957
 EP1975310
 EP1982759
 EP1974807
 EP1974806
 WO0039222
 US2004020410