Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808361

EP2808361 - Composite Composition containing a Polycyclic Ether Polyol [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.10.2015
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.11.2015  [2015/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Allnex Belgium, S.A.
Square Marie-Curie 11
1070 Brussels / BE
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Cappelle, Steven
Okegembaan, 141
9400 Ninove / BE
02 / Vrijsen, Stijn
L. Devillersstraat 8A
1654 Huizingen / BE
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Schoofs, Hilde , et al
Allnex Belgium, S.A.
Patent Department
Anderlechtstraat 33
1620 Drogenbos / BE
[2014/49]
Application number, filing date13169433.328.05.2013
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808361
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:C08L33/14, C08K7/02, C08J5/04
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verbundstoffzusammensetzung mit einem polyzyklischen Etherpolyol[2014/49]
English:Composite Composition containing a Polycyclic Ether Polyol[2014/49]
French:Composition composite contenant un polyol d'éther polycyclique[2014/49]
Examination procedure28.05.2013Examination requested  [2014/49]
04.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/48]
10.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/48]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2006036029  (TOMKO RICHARD F [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * example -; claim - * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035] * [I] 1-15;
 [I]US5275874  (BRANDENBURG KATHRYN L [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * example -; claim - *
by applicantUS7291657
 US8012573
 EP2226171
 US7250209
 US8263503
 US7268172