Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808250

EP2808250 - Aircraft flap system with aileron functionality [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Burchard, Alexander
An der Buersteler Heide 1b
28816 Stuhr / DE
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[2018/01]
Former [2014/49]Peckmann, Ralf
Isarpatent
Friedrichstraße 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date13169534.828.05.2013
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808250
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2808250
Date:03.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:B64C9/16
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/01]
Former [2014/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Flugzeugklappensystem mit Querruderfunktionalität[2014/49]
English:Aircraft flap system with aileron functionality[2014/49]
French:Système de volet d'avion avec une fonctionnalité d'aileron[2014/49]
Examination procedure13.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/13]
28.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.11.2017Fee for grant paid
23.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.09.2017
Opposition(s)05.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
MC03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SI03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
IE28.05.2018
LU28.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/19]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
MC03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SI03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
IE28.05.2018
LU28.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/17]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
MC03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SI03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
LU28.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
MC03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SI03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
MC03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
SM03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
DK03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
CZ03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
SK03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
EE03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RO03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
IT03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL03.01.2018
AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
BG03.04.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT03.01.2018
CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
LV03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
RS03.01.2018
SE03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
IS03.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
GR04.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY03.01.2018
ES03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
PL03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY03.01.2018
FI03.01.2018
HR03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
Former [2018/34]FI03.01.2018
LT03.01.2018
NL03.01.2018
NO03.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]US8444094  (VOSS TIMO [DE] ET AL) [X] 1 * figures 1,5 * [I] 2-15;
 [AD]EP0205939  (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1404573  (EADS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1663777  (MT AEROSPACE AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4705236  (RUDOLPH PETER K C [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS7520471
 US4544118
 US4763862