Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808752

EP2808752 - Performing an action associated with a motion based input [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
[2017/38]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Chen, Zhe
c/o Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Extension 79556
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
02 / Almaki, Nazih
c/o Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Extension 75312
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[2017/38]
Former [2014/49]Patel, Binesh
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham West Midlands
B16 8QQ / GB
Application number, filing date13169560.328.05.2013
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808752
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2808752
Date:20.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16, G06F3/0346
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:Durchführung einer Aktion im Zusammenhang mit einer bewegungsbasierten Eingabe[2014/49]
English:Performing an action associated with a motion based input[2014/49]
French:Exécution d'une action associée à une entrée à base de mouvement[2014/49]
Examination procedure28.05.2013Examination requested  [2014/49]
02.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.03.2017
23.03.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
31.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.2017Fee for grant paid
25.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.01.2016
Opposition(s)21.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
IE28.05.2018
LU28.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/19]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
IE28.05.2018
LU28.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/17]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
LU28.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/12]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
Former [2019/06]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
MC20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SI20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/35]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
DK20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT20.09.2017
CZ20.09.2017
EE20.09.2017
ES20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
IT20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
PL20.09.2017
RO20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
SK20.09.2017
SM20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
IS20.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ20.09.2017
FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/15]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
NL20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/12]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
LV20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/11]FI20.09.2017
HR20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
RS20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
BG20.12.2017
NO20.12.2017
GR21.12.2017
Former [2018/09]FI20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
SE20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI20.09.2017
LT20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT20.09.2017
NO20.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010125816  (BEZOS JEFFREY P [US]) [X] 1-6,9,11,12 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0084] * * figure 2 * * figure 12b * [I] 7,8,10;
 [A]US2008055263  (LEMAY STEPHEN O [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0288] - paragraph [0300] * * paragraph [0337] - paragraph [0338] * * figures 12B-C * * figure 19F *;
 [A]US2011306304  (FORUTANPOUR BABAK [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0072] *;
 [A]US2013104090  (YU EUGENE [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032] * * figure 3 *
ExaminationUS2010188328