Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2670045

EP2670045 - Dual generator system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.03.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019Change - applicantpublished on 22.05.2019  [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation
Four Coliseum Centre
2730 West Tyvola Road
Charlotte, NC 28217 / US
[2019/21]
Former [2013/49]For all designated states
Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation
One Hamilton Road
Windsor Locks, CT 06096-1010 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rozman, Gregory I.
6428 Sawgrass Drive
Rockford, IL Illinois 61114 / US
02 / Gieras, Jacek F.
315 Strickland Street
Glastonbury, CT Connecticut 06033 / US
03 / Moss, Steven J.
3381 Fawnridge Drive
Rockford, IL Illinois 61114 / US
 [2013/49]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/49]Bridge, Kerry Ann
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date13169784.929.05.2013
[2013/49]
Priority number, dateUS20121348682901.06.2012         Original published format: US201213486829
[2013/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2670045
Date:04.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2670045
Date:06.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:H02P9/02, H02P9/30
[2016/27]
Former International [2013/49]H02P9/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/08]
Former [2013/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Duales Generatorsystem[2013/49]
English:Dual generator system[2013/49]
French:Système générateur double[2013/49]
Examination procedure29.05.2013Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/08]
29.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.05.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
26.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2011133563  (BARTON WERNER [DE], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 2-7,9-15;
 [YD]US8085003  (GIERAS JACEK F [US], et al) [YD] 2-4,9-15 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 47; figure 2 *;
 [Y]EP2341608  (HAMILTON SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [Y] 5-7 * abstract *;
 [A]US5254936  (LEAF LARRY J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2010148518  (ALGRAIN MARCELO C [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
by applicantUS8085003