Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807945

EP2807945 - Electric hairdryer with a white light emitting device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Database last updated on 23.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.05.2018  [2018/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johnson Elettrodomestici S.p.A.
Viale Kennedy, 596
21050 Marnate (VA) / IT
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Picozzi, Ernesto
c/o Johnson Elettrodomestici S.p.A.
Viale Kennedy, 596
I-21050 Marnate (VA) / IT
02 / Malpetti, Roberto
c/o Johnson Elettrodomestici S.p.A.
Viale Kennedy, 596
I-21050 Marnate (VA) / IT
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Rastelli, Franco
Dott. Franco Cicogna & C. SRL
Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A
20122 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Cicogna, Franco
Ufficio Internazionale Brevetti
Dott.Prof. Franco Cicogna
Via Visconti di Modrone, 14/A
20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date13169882.130.05.2013
[2014/49]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807945
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A45D20/12, A45D20/10, A45D20/08
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Elektrische Haartrockner mit einer Weißlicht emittierenden Vorrichtung[2014/49]
English:Electric hairdryer with a white light emitting device[2014/49]
French:Sèche-cheveux électrique comportant un dispositif d'émission de lumière blanche[2014/49]
Examination procedure11.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/25]
12.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/21]
15.01.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2009000141  (GROSS JEFFERY D [US] ET AL GROSS JEFFREY D [US] ET AL) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0020] - [0024]; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]EP1306028  (TROLETTI ADRIANO [IT]) [X] 1-5,7 * paragraphs [0016] - [0027]; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US6285828  (CAFARO MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-5,7 * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 3 *;
 [X]US2008201979  (RHOADES DEAN L [US]) [X] 1-5,7 * paragraph [0024]; figures 1a,2,3 *;
 [XI]US1781879  (OLIVER NORDEN) [X] 1-4,7 * the whole document * [I] 5;
 [XI]US1006767  (MAUGER HENRY J [US]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [I] 4;
 [X]US2428630  (LANTER CLARENCE W) [X] 1,2,7 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3786575  (RIBLETT E) [X] 1,2,7 * the whole document *