Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2635060

EP2635060 - Mutual authentication with modified message authentication code [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.08.2014
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive, R-132 D
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2013/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Semple, James
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / GB
02 / Rose, Gregory Gordon
3234 North Star Drive
San Diego, CA 92117 / US
03 / Paddon, Michael
31 Armine Way
Kellyville, New South Wales 2155 / AU
04 / Hawkes, Philip Michael
18-20 Knocklayde St.
Unit 30
Ashfield, New South Wales 2131 / AU
 [2013/42]
Former [2013/36]01 / Semple, James
7 Queensgate Place
Flat 4
London, SW7 5NU / GB
02 / Rose, Gregory Gordon
3234 North Star Drive
San Diego, CA 92117 / US
03 / Paddon, Michael
31 Armine Way
Kellyville, New South Wales 2155 / AU
04 / Hawkes, Philip Michael
18-20 Knocklayde St.
Unit 30
Ashfield, New South Wales 2131 / AU
Representative(s)Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2013/36]Catesby, Olivia Joanne , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date13169907.608.09.2005
[2013/36]
Priority number, dateUS20040608424P08.09.2004         Original published format: US 608424 P
US2005021883202.09.2005         Original published format: US 218832
[2013/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2635060
Date:04.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W12/06, // H04W12/10
[2013/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2013/36]
TitleGerman:Gegenseitige Authentifizierung mit modifiziertem Nachrichtenauthentifizierungscode[2013/36]
English:Mutual authentication with modified message authentication code[2013/36]
French:Authentification mutuelle avec code d'authentification de message modifié[2013/36]
Examination procedure30.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/36]
04.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination23.12.2015Appeal received No.  T0676/16
09.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
08.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05812748.1  / EP1787489
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
30.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
30.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 09
08.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 10
08.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 11
08.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 12
11.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
11.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1209934  (SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [X] 8-17,19-21 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] * [Y] 1-7,18,22-25;
 [A]GB2356530  (* VODAFONE LIMITED) [A] 1-25 * abstract * * page 3, line 5 - line 13 * * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 5 * * page 5, line 12 - line 14 * * page 8, line 14 - line 18 *;
 [YL]  - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); 3G Security; Security Architecture (3GPP TS 33.102 version 3.6.0 Release 1999); ETSI TS 133 102", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200010), vol. 3-SA3, no. V360, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014010185 [Y] 1-7,18,22-25 * page 60, line 3 - line 7 * [L] 1-7,18,22-25
 [A]  - "3GPP TS 33.220 - 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT; TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION GROUP SERVICES AND SYSTEM ASPECTS; GENERIC AUTHENTICATION ARCHITECTURE (GAA); GENERIC BOOTSTRAPPING ARCHITECTURE (RELEASE 6)", 3GPP TS 33.220 V6.0.0, XX, XX, (200403), pages 1 - 18, XP002334596 [A] 1-25 * the whole document *