Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808576

EP2808576 - Joint arrangement, drive system for driving control surfaces of an aircraft and aircraft with such a drive system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.02.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL, SM
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
[2019/12]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Zantz, Tanno
Am Eichenanger 16
28832 Achim / DE
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf PartG mbB Patentanwälte
Brienner Straße 11
80333 München / DE
[2019/12]
Former [2014/49]Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Engineering
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date13169964.731.05.2013
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808576
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2808576
Date:20.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:F16D3/2233, F16D3/224
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Former [2014/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verbindungsanordnung, Antriebssystem zum Antrieb von Steuerflächen eines Flugzeuges sowie Flugzeug mit solch einem Antriebssystem[2014/49]
English:Joint arrangement, drive system for driving control surfaces of an aircraft and aircraft with such a drive system[2014/49]
French:Dispositif d'articulation, système d'entraînement pour gouvernes d'un aéronef et aéronef comportant un tel système d'entraînement[2014/49]
Examination procedure16.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/22]
09.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2019Fee for grant paid
07.02.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.11.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
23.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL20.03.2019
CZ20.03.2019
EE20.03.2019
ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
IT20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
PL20.03.2019
RO20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
SK20.03.2019
SM20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
PT20.07.2019
[2019/52]
Former [2019/49]AL20.03.2019
CZ20.03.2019
EE20.03.2019
ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
IT20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RO20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
SK20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
PT20.07.2019
Former [2019/48]ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
IT20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
PT20.07.2019
Former [2019/47]ES20.03.2019
FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
IT20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
IT20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI20.03.2019
HR20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
LV20.03.2019
NL20.03.2019
RS20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
BG20.06.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
NO20.06.2019
GR21.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
SE20.03.2019
NO20.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI20.03.2019
LT20.03.2019
NO20.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0345840  (SKF IND TRADING & DEV [NL]) [X] 1-4,8,9 * column 2, line 2 - column 4, line 15; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US4432741  (WINKLER OTTMAR [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 9 - column 5, line 65; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]EP0908639  (NSK LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0112]; figures 1-9 *
by applicantUS1916442
 EP1462361
 US7048234
 DE3620886
 US4786013
 WO2008080709