Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2808576


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.12.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.01.2020 [2020/01]
22.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.12.2019 [2019/52]
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019 [2019/50]
01.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.12.2019  [2019/49]
25.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.11.2019  [2019/48]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
11.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.11.2019  [2019/46]
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
23.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
12.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
15.02.2019 (Expected) grant published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
11.02.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.02.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.02.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
08.11.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.05.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.05.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.05.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.03.2016 Change - representative
27.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.04.2015 Change - designated states published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
24.04.2015 Change - request for examination published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
22.04.2015 Amendment by applicant
02.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]
31.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  03.12.2014  [2014/49]