Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810575

EP2810575 - Outer clothing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.11.2015
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.12.2015  [2015/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Maletz, Tobias
Ringental 20
89537 Giengen / DE
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Andrae Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Uhlandstrasse 2
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Andrae Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Uhlandstrasse 2
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date13170409.004.06.2013
[2014/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810575
Date:10.12.2014
Language:DE
[2014/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:A41F17/00
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Oberbekleidung[2014/50]
English:Outer clothing[2014/50]
French:Habillage supérieur[2014/50]
Examination procedure04.06.2013Examination requested  [2014/50]
11.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/49]
17.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/49]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2007277283  (BOROWSKI ROBERT J [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,8,9,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0015] * [I] 3,5;
 [X]US2011197332  (YU CHING-HUNG [TW]) [X] 1,4,6,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0008] , [0023] , [0025] - [0028] *;
 [I]US5758366  (WILSON BARRY E [US]) [I] 1-3,8,9,11 * abstract * * sentence 4 - sentence 11 * * column 1, line 25 - line 26 * * column 1, line 41 - line 43 * * column 2, line 42 - line 56 *
by applicantUS2005114979
 DE102004063586
 WO0047071
 JPH03115611
 DE29619508U
 US3737916
 US5754982
 US7398558
 DE3228720
 JPS6111712
 FR2803177
 JP2011190547
 CH704437
 DE1217297