Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2811288

EP2811288 - Method for electron tomography [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.2017
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FEI COMPANY
5350 NE Dawson Creek Drive
Hillsboro, Oregon 97124-5793 / US
[2014/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Luecken, Uwe
Charlevillehof 23
5627 DG EINDHOVEN / NL
02 / Schoenmakers, Remco
Koevelden 17
5685 HE Best / NL
03 / Van den Oetelaar, Johannes
Boerhaavelaan 50
5644 BE Eindhoven / NL
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Bakker, Hendrik
FEI Company
Patent Department
P.O. Box 1745
5602 BS Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Bakker, Hendrik
FEI Company Patent Department P.O. Box 1745
5602 BS Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date13170871.106.06.2013
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2811288
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2811288
Date:10.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N23/04
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/26]
Former [2014/50]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Elektronentomographie[2014/50]
English:Method for electron tomography[2014/50]
French:Procédé de tomographie d'électrons[2014/50]
Examination procedure13.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/26]
20.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2016Fee for grant paid
01.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.08.2015
Opposition(s)11.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.06.2013
AL10.08.2016
AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CY10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
MK10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU06.06.2013
AL10.08.2016
AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CY10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2019/31]HU06.06.2013
AL10.08.2016
AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2018/46]AL10.08.2016
AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2018/11]AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
MC10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/37]AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SI10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/32]AT10.08.2016
BE10.08.2016
CZ10.08.2016
DK10.08.2016
EE10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RO10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
SK10.08.2016
SM10.08.2016
BG10.11.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/13]AT10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
LV10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/11]AT10.08.2016
ES10.08.2016
FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
NO10.11.2016
GR11.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
PT12.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI10.08.2016
HR10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
PL10.08.2016
RS10.08.2016
SE10.08.2016
NO10.11.2016
IS10.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI10.08.2016
IT10.08.2016
LT10.08.2016
NL10.08.2016
NO10.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT10.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1970936  (HITACHI HIGH TECH CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-10,12 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1, 2, 11 *;
 [IY]EP1975974  (JEOL LTD [JP]) [I] 11 * paragraphs [0024] , [ 0049] , [ 0050]; figure 1 * [Y] 1-10,12;
 [Y]US2009065708  (MOON WON JIN [KR] ET AL) [Y] 1-10,12 * paragraph [0011] *;
 [A]  - W BAUMEISTER, "Electron tomography of molecules and cells", TRENDS IN CELL BIOLOGY, (19990201), vol. 9, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0962-8924(98)01423-8, ISSN 0962-8924, pages 81 - 85, XP055074721 [A] 1-12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0962-8924(98)01423-8
 [AD]  - Anonymous, "Functional description of Tecnai Tomography Software", (20031231), pages 1 - 20, FEI Company Technical Note, URL: http://www4.utsouthwestern.edu/mcif/manuals/tomography/tomography%20functional%20description.pdf, (20130814), XP002711126 [AD] 1-12 * the whole document *