Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2811288 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410247938 EP13170871



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9147551Global Dossier 29.09.2015B2
US2015069231 12.03.2015A1
Priority number Date
EP13170871 06.06.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5820020BGlobal Dossier 24.11.2015B2
JP2014239039 18.12.2014A
Priority number Date
EP13170871 06.06.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104224216BGlobal Dossier 28.07.2017B
CN104224216 24.12.2014A
Priority number Date
EP13170871 06.06.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2811288Global Dossier 10.08.2016B1
EP2811288 10.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13170871 06.06.2013