blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2674802


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.09.2019 [2019/38]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019 [2019/37]
26.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.08.2019 [2019/35]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
12.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
21.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
21.12.2018 (Expected) grant published on  23.01.2019  [2019/04]
19.12.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
06.12.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.11.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
30.11.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.11.2018 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.07.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.06.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.06.2018 Change - applicant published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
15.06.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.06.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.06.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
20.06.2014 Change - designated states published on  23.07.2014  [2014/30]
17.06.2014 Amendment by applicant
17.12.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  18.12.2013  [2013/51]