Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2674802

EP2674802 - Remote optical apparatus with control electronics [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Swarovski-Optik KG.
Daniel-Swarovski-Strasse 70
6067 Absam / AT
[2018/29]
Former [2013/51]For all designated states
SWAROVSKI OPTIK KG
Daniel-Swarovski-Strasse 70
6067 Absam / AT
Inventor(s)01 / WECHSELBERGER, Sandra
Archenwald 8
6114 Weer / AT
 [2013/51]
Representative(s)Burger, Hannes
Anwälte Burger & Partner
Rechtsanwalt GmbH
Rosenauerweg 16
4580 Windischgarsten / AT
[2013/51]
Application number, filing date13171216.810.06.2013
[2013/51]
Priority number, dateAT2012000068714.06.2012         Original published format: AT 6872012
[2013/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2674802
Date:18.12.2013
Language:DE
[2013/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2674802
Date:23.01.2019
Language:DE
[2019/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G02B23/14, F41G1/38
[2013/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/04]
Former [2013/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fernoptisches Gerät mit Steuerelektronik[2013/51]
English:Remote optical apparatus with control electronics[2013/51]
French:Appareil optique à distance avec électronique de commande[2013/51]
Examination procedure12.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/30]
06.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
05.11.2018Fee for grant paid
05.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.07.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
13.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
07.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
18.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
[2019/38]
Former [2019/37]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NL23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL23.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2012030985  (MAURICIO JEREMIAH [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12,14,15 * figures 7-11, 19-21 * * paragraphs [0102] , [0122] , [0134] , [0135] * [I] 7,13;
 [X]US7827725  (HAGLER LLOYD [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * figure 1 * * column 1, lines 21-23 *;
 [X]DE202005008874U  (SWAROVSKI OPTIK KG [AT]) [X] 1-3,5 * figures 1, 6 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0021] *;
 [X]WO2009039546  (SWAROVSKI OPTIK KG [AT], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 12 * * page 8, lines 13-29 *
ExaminationUS7624528
by applicantAT504242B
 DE202006014923U
 CN101017239