Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2813520 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2813520



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 59
18.11.2015 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
04.08.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
28.07.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
22.12.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
08.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.12.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.12.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 1
05.12.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
04.09.2013 Amendments not yet acceptable Search / examination 2
22.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
22.08.2013 Annex Search / examination 2
22.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.08.2013 Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application Search / examination 2
11.07.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
11.07.2013 Invitation to indicate the subject-matter to be searched Search / examination 2
08.07.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
11.06.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
11.06.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
11.06.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
11.06.2013 Description Search / examination 14
11.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
11.06.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5