Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2813520


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.11.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  23.12.2015  [2015/52]
05.08.2015 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
27.07.2015 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
17.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
14.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]