Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2813520 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201480032824 EP13171408 EP14733553



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10208144Global Dossier 19.02.2019B2
US2018009916 11.01.2018A1
Priority number Date
US201715677814 15.08.2017
WO2014EP61977 10.06.2014
EP13171408 11.06.2013
US201514897597 10.12.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9771439Global Dossier 26.09.2017B2
US2016130376 12.05.2016A1
Priority number Date
WO2014EP61977 10.06.2014
EP13171408 11.06.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101775261BGlobal Dossier 05.09.2017B1
KR20160012202 02.02.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014EP61977 10.06.2014
EP13171408 11.06.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6154552BGlobal Dossier 28.06.2017B2
JP2016523295 08.08.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014EP61977 10.06.2014
EP13171408 11.06.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2931755Global Dossier 15.06.2016B1
EP2931755 21.10.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2014EP61977 10.06.2014
EP13171408 11.06.2013
EP14733553 10.06.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105283470BGlobal Dossier 02.01.2018B
CN105283470 27.01.2016A
Priority number Date
WO2014EP61977 10.06.2014
EP13171408 11.06.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112015030724 25.07.2017A2
Priority number Date
WO2014EP61977 10.06.2014
EP13171408 11.06.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2638529 14.12.2017C2
RU2015155507 30.06.2017A
Priority number Date
WO2014EP61977 10.06.2014
EP13171408 11.06.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SG11201509669V 30.12.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2014EP61977 10.06.2014
EP13171408 11.06.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2014198693Global Dossier 18.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13171408 11.06.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2813520Global Dossier 17.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13171408 11.06.2013