Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813520

EP2813520 - Polymerization process in the presence of an antistatically acting composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.11.2015
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.12.2015  [2015/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Brühler Strasse 60
50389 Wesseling / DE
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Mihan, Shahram
Schillerstraße 25
65812 Bad Soden / DE
02 / Meier, Gerhardus
Eichendorffstrasse 3
60320 Frankfurt / DE
03 / Schueller, Ulf
Graefstrasse 80
60486 Frankfurt/M / DE
04 / Schiendorfer, Michael
Hildegard-von-Bingen-Weg 2
60439 Frankfurt / DE
05 / Wiesecke, Jens
Karolingerweg 11
69123 Heidelberg / DE
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Seelert, Stefan
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Intellectual Property
Bldg. E413, 5.OG
Industriepark Höchst
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Seelert, Stefan
Basell Polyolefine GmbH
Intellectual Property
Bldg. C657, 2nd floor
Industriepark Höchst
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date13171408.111.06.2013
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813520
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:C08F2/34, C08F10/02
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Polymerisationsverfahren in Gegenwart einer antistatisch wirkenden Zusammensetzung[2014/51]
English:Polymerization process in the presence of an antistatically acting composition[2014/51]
French:Procédé de polymérisation en présence d'une composition agissant de façon antistatique[2014/51]
Examination procedure11.06.2013Examination requested  [2014/51]
18.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/52]
28.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/52]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]BE645961  (UNION CARBIDE CORP.) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO2011072850  (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document *
by applicantUS3917466
 WO2008107371
 US5026795
 WO0240554
 WO2007131646
 WO2011072850
 EP0315192
 EP0366823
 US3242150
 US3248179
 WO9704015
 WO0002929
 EP0535516