Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813918

EP2813918 - Electronic pen [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.11.2015
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.12.2015  [2015/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Anoto AB
Box 4106
227 22 Lund / SE
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Sjögren, Anders
Källarekroken 40
226 47 Lund / SE
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Grönlund, Tim Linus Wilhelm
Anoto AB
Box 4106
227 22 Lund / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Grönlund, Tim Linus Wilhelm
Anoto AB Box 4106
227 22 Lund / SE
Application number, filing date13171541.911.06.2013
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813918
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/32, G06F3/0354
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Elektronischer Stift[2014/51]
English:Electronic pen[2014/51]
French:Stylo électronique[2014/51]
Examination procedure11.06.2013Examination requested  [2014/51]
18.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/52]
04.08.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/52]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004066473  (ANOTO AB [SE]; THULESIUS MAGNUS [SE]; BURSTROEM STEFAN [SE]) [X] 1-5 * page 1, line 10 - page 20, line 5; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US2012062520  (KNEE DEREK LESLIE [US]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]WO2008002239  (ANOTO AB [SE]; DUNKARS ANDERS [SE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [AD]WO02093467  (ANOTO AB [SE]; FAAHRAEUS CHRISTER [SE]; LINDGREN JOHAN [SE]; BURSTROEM) [AD] 1-5 * the whole document *
by applicantWO02093467
 WO03069547
 US5221833
 US5477012
 US5652412
 WO0073983
 WO0126032
 WO0171643
 US6330976
 US7263224
 WO03001440
 WO2005057447