Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813426

EP2813426 - Shell structure of a fuselage at a door opening and method of forming the shell structure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, FR
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Jörn, Paul
c/o Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
02 / Brok, Wouter
c/o Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
03 / Metten, Martin
c/o Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Schicker, Silvia
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[2017/41]
Former [2014/51]Schicker, Silvia
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date13171702.712.06.2013
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813426
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2813426
Date:11.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:B64C1/14, B64D11/00
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/27]
Former [2014/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Rumpfschale mit einer Türöffnung und Verfahren zur Herstellung der Rumpfschale[2014/51]
English:Shell structure of a fuselage at a door opening and method of forming the shell structure[2014/51]
French:Coque d'un fuselage comprenant une ouverture de porte et procédé de formation de ladite structure[2014/51]
Examination procedure15.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/27]
02.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.2017Fee for grant paid
29.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.05.2017
Opposition(s)12.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
IT11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MC11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
GB12.06.2018
IE12.06.2018
LU12.06.2018
BE30.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
FR30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
[2019/23]
Former [2019/21]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
IT11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MC11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
GB12.06.2018
IE12.06.2018
LU12.06.2018
CH30.06.2018
LI30.06.2018
Former [2019/19]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
IT11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MC11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
IE12.06.2018
LU12.06.2018
Former [2019/17]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
IT11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MC11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
LU12.06.2018
Former [2019/15]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
IT11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MC11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/52]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
IT11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
IT11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/39]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
IT11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
NO11.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL11.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2316733  (EMBRAER AERONAUTICA SA [BR]) [X] 1,2,9,10 * paragraphs [0024] - [0032]; figure - * [I] 3,4,7,8,11;
 [XI]US3658277  (ANDERSON CHARLES I) [X] 1,2,9,10 * column 4, lines 5-45; figures 9,10 * [I] 3,4,7,8,11;
 [XI]US2005211841  (GUARD PETER S [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,10 * paragraphs [0026] , [0037] , [0046] , [0049]; figures 9,13 * [I] 3,4,7,8,11;
 [A]FR2947241  (AIRBUS FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *