Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2813426 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2813426



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 111
16.08.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
19.10.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
14.09.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.08.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.08.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
29.08.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
29.08.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.05.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.05.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.05.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.05.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
02.05.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 18
30.03.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
02.01.2017 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
15.05.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
15.05.2015 Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO Search / examination 5
30.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
26.03.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
22.12.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
19.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
21.10.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.10.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 3
21.10.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
28.08.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
31.07.2013 Drawings Search / examination 3
31.07.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
10.07.2013 Deficiencies in application documents - annex C Search / examination 3
12.06.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.06.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
12.06.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
12.06.2013 Description Search / examination 12
12.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.06.2013 Drawings Search / examination 2
12.06.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4