Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2813426


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
05.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.05.2019  [2019/19]
22.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
08.03.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
17.08.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
11.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
27.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.05.2018  [2018/22]
23.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.04.2018  [2018/17]
08.09.2017 (Expected) grant published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
01.09.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
01.09.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
01.09.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
30.06.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.05.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.06.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.05.2015 Change - designated states published on  01.07.2015  [2015/27]
29.05.2015 Change - request for examination published on  01.07.2015  [2015/27]
20.05.2015 Amendment by applicant
17.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
14.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]