Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2814228

EP2814228 - Method and apparatus for automatically selecting an outbound-call modality [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.09.2017  [2017/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BlackBerry Limited
2200 University Avenue East
Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Fields, Gregory Jason
295 Phillip Street
Ext. 73867
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/51]Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date13171922.113.06.2013
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2814228
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04M1/253, H04M1/2745, H04M1/725
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur automatischen Auswahl einer Modalität für ausgehende Anrufe[2014/51]
English:Method and apparatus for automatically selecting an outbound-call modality[2014/51]
French:Procédé et appareil permettant de sélectionner automatiquement une modalité d'appel sortant[2014/51]
Examination procedure13.06.2013Examination requested  [2014/51]
16.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/38]
10.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/38]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.12.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2005029889  (IBM [US]; IBM UK [GB]; KUSNITZ JEFFREY [US]; SLIWA JAMES [US]) [X] 1,2,5,9,10,13 * paragraphs [0014] - [0028]; figures 1-9 * [I] 3,4,6-8,11,12,14,15;
 [A]US2008166999  (GUEDALIA JACOB [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0056]; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]US2010226362  (KIM JAEWOO [US] ET AL) [A] 1,3,9,11 * paragraphs [0015] - [0034]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0043] - [0051]; figure 4 *;
 [A]US7162237  (SILVER EDWARD MICHAEL [US] ET AL) [A] 1,5,9,13 * column 2, line 35 - column 6, line 55 * * column 8, line 35 - column 9, line 14; figure 7 *