Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2813601

EP2813601 - Device for moving a substrate holder during a vertical gal-vanic metal deposition, and a method for vertical galvanic metal deposition using such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.11.2015
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.12.2015  [2015/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Atotech Deutschland GmbH
Erasmusstrasse 20
10553 Berlin / DE
[2014/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Klingl, Heinz
Schönblickstrasse 3
86356 Neusäss / DE
02 / Weinhold, Ray
Habsburgerstrasse 70a
90475 Nürnberg / DE
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Wonnemann, Jörg
Atotech Deutschland GmbH Patent Management Erasmusstrasse 20
10553 Berlin / DE
[2014/51]
Application number, filing date13171963.514.06.2013
[2014/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2813601
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:C25D5/04, C25D17/06, C25D21/10
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Bewegen eines Substrathalters während einer vertikalen galvanischen Metallabscheidung und Verfahren zur vertikalen galvanischen Metallabscheidung unter Verwendung solch einer Vorrichtung[2014/51]
English:Device for moving a substrate holder during a vertical gal-vanic metal deposition, and a method for vertical galvanic metal deposition using such a device[2014/51]
French:Dispositif pour déplacer un support de substrat pendant un dépôt de métal galvanique vertical et procédé de dépôt de métal galvanique vertical utilisant un tel dispositif[2014/51]
Examination procedure14.06.2013Examination requested  [2014/51]
18.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/51]
24.07.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/51]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE4212045  (SCHERING AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7-13 * column 1, lines 3-8 * * column 3, lines 24-48 * * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 32 * * column 6, line 27 - column 7, line 46; figures 1-3 * [I] 5,6;
 [X]DE102005024771  (HANSGROHE AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,7-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0518] - [0026]; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US2002071917  (HEPTING EMIL [DE]) [X] 1,2,7-13 * paragraphs [0020] - [0035]; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US2004037682  (YOSHIOKA JUNICHIRO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-3,7,8,10,12 * paragraphs [0039] - [0074]; figures 2,3-5,9,10 *;
 [X]GB2247027  (HENIG HANS HENIG HANS [DE]) [X] 1,7-9,11-13 * page 9, line 5 - page 26, line 18; figures 1-8 *;
 [X]EP1441048  (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) [X] 1,3,7-12 * paragraphs [0198] - [0213]; figure 5 *