EP2813564 - Laundry formulation comprising a dye [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unilever PLC A Company Registered In England And Wales Under Company No. 41424 Of Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London, Greater London EC4Y 0DY / GB | [2014/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Batchelor, Stephen Norman Unilever R & D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 02 /
Bird, Jane Michelle Unilever R & D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 03 /
Burnham, Neil Stephen Unilever R & D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 04 /
Crossman, Martin Charles Unilever R & D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington, Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 05 /
Topi, Francesca Unilever Italy Holdings Srl Via Lever Gibbs 3 26841 Casalpusterlengo / IT | [2014/51] | Representative(s) | Avila, David Victor, et al Unilever PLC Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB | [2014/51] | Application number, filing date | 13171971.8 | 14.06.2013 | [2014/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2813564 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/40 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
C11D3/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Farbstoff enthaltende Waschmittelformulierung | [2014/51] | English: | Laundry formulation comprising a dye | [2014/51] | French: | Formulation de lessive contenant un colorant | [2014/51] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2013 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 26.02.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO2012166768 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [ID] 1-12 * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 26 * * pages 11-18; table 1 * * page 53, line 25 - page 54, line 4 * * pages 59-60; examples 14-20 * * claim - *; | [I]WO2013006871 (MILLIKEN & CO [US]) [I] 1-12 * page 1, line 31 - page 3, line 4 * * pages 14-21; table 1 * * page 62, lines 1-14 * * pages 67-69; examples 14-20 * * claim - * |