blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2762043 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2762043



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 102
13.04.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
01.07.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
10.06.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
15.05.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.04.2015 English translation of the claims Search / examination 1
28.04.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
28.04.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
28.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.02.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.02.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.02.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.02.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 6
19.01.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.12.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
15.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
15.12.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
15.12.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
15.12.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
11.12.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
11.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.12.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
11.12.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
11.12.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
11.12.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
11.12.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
11.08.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
09.07.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
09.09.2013 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.08.2013 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
21.08.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.08.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 3
21.08.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
15.08.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 10
13.08.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
12.07.2013 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 5
14.06.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.06.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
14.06.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
14.06.2013 Description Search / examination 5
14.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.06.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5