blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2762043


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
08.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
25.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.09.2017  [2017/39]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
13.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2016  [2016/24]
15.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
15.04.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
01.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.05.2016  [2016/18]
19.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
12.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
05.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
29.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.03.2016  [2016/09]
13.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.12.2015  [2015/51]
06.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
04.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
16.05.2015 (Expected) grant published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
01.05.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
01.05.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
29.04.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
03.02.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
23.01.2015 Change - classification published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
19.12.2014 Change - designated states published on  21.01.2015  [2015/04]
19.12.2014 Change - request for examination published on  21.01.2015  [2015/04]
16.12.2014 Amendment by applicant
05.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.08.2014  [2014/32]
04.07.2014 Request for examination filed published on  06.08.2014  [2014/32]