blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2762043
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2762043Global Dossier 10.06.2015B1
EP2762043 06.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP13172006 14.06.2013
EP13153732 01.02.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK2762043T 14.09.2015T3
Priority number Date
EP13153732 01.02.2013