Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2762043

EP2762043 - Mattress, topper, protector, bedspread or pillowcase fabric and liner and mattress, topper, protector, pillow or bedspread core [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2016
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bodet & Horst GmbH & Co. KG
Gewerbegebiet 9
09481 Elterlein / DE
[2014/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Horst, Gerd-Hermann
Kiefernstraße 11
48477 Hörstel / DE
 [2014/32]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/32]Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
Application number, filing date13172006.214.06.2013
[2014/32]
Priority number, dateEP2013015373201.02.2013         Original published format: EP 13153732
[2014/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2762043
Date:06.08.2014
Language:DE
[2014/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2762043
Date:10.06.2015
Language:DE
[2015/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A47C31/00
[2014/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/24]
Former [2014/32]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Matratzen-, Topper-, Schoner-, Bettdecken- oder Kissenbezugsstoff und -bezug sowie Matratzen-, Topper-, Schoner-, Kissen- oder Bettdeckenkern[2014/32]
English:Mattress, topper, protector, bedspread or pillowcase fabric and liner and mattress, topper, protector, pillow or bedspread core[2014/32]
French:Tissu de garnissage de coussin, couverture, genouillère, surmatelas ou matelas et intérieur de coussin, couverture, genouillère, surmatelas ou matelas[2014/32]
Examination procedure11.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/04]
02.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.04.2015Fee for grant paid
28.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.02.2015
Opposition(s)11.03.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.06.2013
AL10.06.2015
CY10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
HR10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
MK10.06.2015
MT10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SE10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
SM10.06.2015
IE14.06.2015
LU14.06.2015
FR10.08.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
[2018/47]
Former [2018/29]HU14.06.2013
CY10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
HR10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
MK10.06.2015
MT10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SE10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
SM10.06.2015
IE14.06.2015
LU14.06.2015
FR10.08.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2018/02]HU14.06.2013
CY10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
HR10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
MT10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SE10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
IE14.06.2015
LU14.06.2015
FR10.08.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2017/39]HU14.06.2013
CY10.06.2015
CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
HR10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
MT10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SE10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
IE14.06.2015
FR10.08.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2017/03]CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
MT10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
IE14.06.2015
FR10.08.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/50]CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
IE14.06.2015
FR10.08.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/24]CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SI10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
IE14.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/20]CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
IE14.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/18]CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
MC10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ10.06.2015
EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
PL10.06.2015
RO10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
SK10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
IS10.10.2015
PT12.10.2015
Former [2016/09]EE10.06.2015
ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
BG10.09.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES10.06.2015
FI10.06.2015
LT10.06.2015
LV10.06.2015
RS10.06.2015
NO10.09.2015
GR11.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2011061270  (PNEUMA PURE I P LTD [IE], et al) [X] 8,10 * the whole document * [Y] 1,3,6,7,9,11;
 [Y]US2005132754  (TANIGUCHI YOSHIMICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3,6,7,9,11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2008021293  (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2006223401  (CHANG KUEI-JUNG [TW]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2011146663  (KILTRONX ENVIRO SYSTEMS LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *