EP2816509 - An anti-counterfeit label device and method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University College Cork National University of Ireland, Cork Western Road Cork City / IE | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burke, Michael 17 Eaton Heights Cobh Cork / IE | 02 /
Quinn, Aidan 39 Ardfallen Estate Douglas Road Cork / IE | 03 /
Manning, Mary Dromahane Mallow Cork / IE | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Lucey, Michael, et al PurdyLucey Intellectual Property Limited 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D02 FH73 Dublin 2 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Lucey, Michael, et al PurdyLucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D2 Dublin / IE | Application number, filing date | 13172247.2 | 17.06.2013 | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2816509 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/16, G06K19/06 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
G06K19/16 (EP);
G06K19/06065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fälschungssichere Etikettvorrichtung und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2014/52] | English: | An anti-counterfeit label device and method of making same | [2014/52] | French: | Dispositif d'étiquette anti-contrefaçon et son procédé de fabrication | [2014/52] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/52] | 17.06.2013 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 25.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/53] | 04.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/53] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 12.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.11.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 12.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.11.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9721184 (ADVANCED DEPOSITION TECHNOLOGI [US]) [X] 1-8,11,12 * abstract * * page 9, line 4 - page 12, line 6 * * page 13, line 22 - line 30 * * figures 6a-b,7a-e,10,11 * [A] 9,10 |