Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815729

EP2815729 - Cervical orthosis [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.03.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.03.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rakuhokugishi. Prosthetic and Orthotic Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
22-banchi-no-16, Inui-cho
Okitayama Haradani, Kita-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu
Kyoto 603-8487 / JP
For all designated states
Rehabitech Co., Ltd.
22-banchi-no-16, Inui-cho
Okitayama Haradani, Kita-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu
Kyoto 603-8487 / JP
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Sakamoto, Tsutomu
RAKUHOKUGISHI. PROSTHETIC AND ORTHOTIC
MANUFACTURING Co., LTD.
22-banchi-no-16
Inui-cho, Okitayama Haradani, Kita-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu, Kyoto 603-8487 / JP
02 / Sakamoto, Akinobu
REHABITECH Co., LTD.
22-banchi-no-16
Inui-cho, Okitayama Haradani
Kita-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu, Kyoto 603-8487 / JP
03 / Hanajima, Takeshi
REHABITECH Co., LTD.
22-banchi-no-16
Inui-cho, Okitayama Haradani
Kita-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu, Kyoto 603-8487 / JP
04 / Masuhara, Ban
REHABITECH Co., LTD.
22-banchi-no-16
Inui-cho, Okitayama Haradani
Kita-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu, Kyoto 603-8487 / JP
05 / Nomura, Masaya
REHABITECH Co., LTD.
22-banchi-no-16
Inui-cho, Okitayama Haradani
Kita-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu, Kyoto 603-8487 / JP
06 / Mori, Kanji
Shiga University of Medical Science
Seta-Tsukinowa-cho
Otsu-shi, Shiga-ken
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu, Kyoto 603-8487 / JP
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Cabinet Netter
36, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Zimmermann, Alain
Cabinet Malemont
91 avenue Kléber
75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date13172312.417.06.2013
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815729
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61F5/055
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/30]
Former [2014/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Zervikalorthese[2014/52]
English:Cervical orthosis[2014/52]
French:Orthèse cervicale[2014/52]
Examination procedure20.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/30]
29.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.01.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
29.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201503   M06   Fee paid on   12.11.2015
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005187504  (MODGLIN MICHAEL D [US]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0024] - [0038] - [0069] - [0074]; figures 3-7 *;
 [X]US6254560  (TWEARDY LISA A G [CH], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 5, lines 6-33; figures 1,2,6,7 *;
 [XI]US2008004556  (GEHLBACH PETER L [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0021] , [0024] - [0041]; figures 1,7 * [I] 2;
 [X]US2005027222  (HARTY ROBERT D [US]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0032] - [0043]; figures 2b,4,6 *
by applicantJPH063311U