blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2815729 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2815729



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 89
11.03.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.03.2019 Invitation to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
26.02.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
15.02.2019 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
15.05.2017 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.04.2017 Claims Search / examination 2
07.04.2017 Description Search / examination 1
07.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.04.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.02.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
24.02.2017 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 2
24.02.2017 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
06.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.04.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
06.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.04.2016 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.04.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
29.01.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
29.01.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.01.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.08.2015 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
10.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.06.2015 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
04.07.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
04.07.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
20.06.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
20.06.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
20.06.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
08.03.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
05.12.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.12.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 3
05.12.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
22.11.2013 Search started Search / examination 1
17.06.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.06.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
17.06.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
17.06.2013 Description Search / examination 10
17.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.06.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.06.2013 Drawings Search / examination 5
17.06.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5