blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2815729


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.08.2019 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
31.07.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.03.2019 Change - representative
30.05.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.07.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.03.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
01.06.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.04.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.02.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.01.2016 First examination report
16.11.2015 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
16.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.08.2015 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
19.06.2015 Change - designated states published on  22.07.2015  [2015/30]
19.06.2015 Change - request for examination published on  22.07.2015  [2015/30]
23.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
21.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
24.06.2014 Amendment by applicant