Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2815972

EP2815972 - Cargo container comprising a storage rack module and a transport module, vehicle therewith and method of operating thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.08.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.09.2017  [2017/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Ebeling, Stefan
c/o Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
02 / Gärtner, Jens
Heidritterstrasse 3
20359 Hamburg / DE
03 / Köhler, Andreas
Grossheidestrasse 31
22303 Hamburg / DE
04 / Lange, Roland
Alte Dorfstrasse 20
21640 Nottensdorf / DE
05 / Rosenthal, Thomas
Gertrudenstrasse 6B
18057 Rostock / DE
06 / Kotian, Raj
Sillemstrasse 64
20257 Hamburg / DE
07 / Schliwa, Ralf
c/o Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
08 / Reiss, Matthias
c/o Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
 [2015/09]
Former [2014/52]01 / Ebeling, Stefan
c/o Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
02 / Gärtner, Jens
Heidritterstrasse 3
20359 Hamburg / DE
03 / Köhler, Andreas
Grossheidestrasse 31
22303 Hamburg / DE
04 / Lange, Roland
Alte Dorfstrasse 20
21640 Nottensdorf / DE
05 / Rosenthal, Thomas
Gertrudenstrasse 6B
18057 Rostock / DE
06 / Kotian, Raj
Sillemstrasse 64
20257 Hamburg / DE
07 / Chliwa, Ralf
c/o Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
08 / Reiss, Matthias
c/o Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
Representative(s)Bird & Bird LLP
Großer Grasbrook 9
20457 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date13172370.217.06.2013
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2815972
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:B64D11/00, B64D11/04
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/32]
Former [2014/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Frachtcontainer mit einem Lagerregalmodul und einem Transportmodul, Fahrzeug damit und Verfahren zum Betrieb eines solchen[2014/52]
English:Cargo container comprising a storage rack module and a transport module, vehicle therewith and method of operating thereof[2014/52]
French:Conteneur de transport comprenant un module d'étagère de stockage et un module de transport, véhicule avec un tel conteneur et méthode d'utilisation d'un tel conteneur[2014/52]
Examination procedure24.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/32]
08.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/39]
23.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/39]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.12.2015
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
28.09.2016Request for further processing filed
28.09.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.10.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201705   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6059229  (LURIA DAVID [IL]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-15 * column 12, line 48 - column 15, line 45 * * figures 17-24 * [I] 3,8;
 [I]EP0443897  (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [I] 1-15 * column 6, line 18 - column 12, line 9 * * figures 1-15C *;
 [A]US6454208  (NERVIG STEVEN N [US] ET AL) [A] 1,3,11,15 * column 2, line 52 - column 6, line 2 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [A]DE19904906  (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AEROSPACE [DE] AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,11,15 * column 2, line 57 - column 5, line 36 * * figures 1-8 *;
 [A]NL8403373  (G B HOLST B V) [A] 8 * figures 1-7 *